EP0743621 - Change returning device of coin mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372-8502 / JP | ||
Former [1996/47] | For all designated states SANDEN CORPORATION 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma, 372 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satoh, Naoto c/o Sanden Corporation, 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372 / JP | 02 /
Ohsato, Kazumi c/o Sanden Corporation, 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372 / JP | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96303194.3 | 08.05.1996 | [1996/47] | Priority number, date | JP19950121849 | 19.05.1995 Original published format: JP 12184995 | [1996/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0743621 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0743621 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G07D1/00 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
G07D1/00 (EP,US);
G07F5/24 (KR);
G07D1/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/47] | Title | German: | Münzausgabevorrichtung | [1996/47] | English: | Change returning device of coin mechanism | [1996/47] | French: | Dispositif pour distribuer des pièces de monnaie | [1996/47] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/28] | 24.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE2923751 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1 * page 9, line 11 - page 10, line 31; figures 2-4 * [A] 3; | [A]US4313450 (KIRISAWA NORIAKI) [A] 1-3 * column A; figures 3,5 *; | [Y]US4606362 (KOBAYASHI OSAMU [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 9 - line 44; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5011456 (KOBAYASHI OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1* column A; figures 1,6 * |