EP0742629 - Forced encapsulation enclosure for an elongate cable splice [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMAS & BETTS CORPORATION (a Tennessee Corporation) 1555 Lynnfield Road Memphis, Tennessee 38119 / US | [1999/35] |
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states THOMAS & BETTS CORPORATION 1555 Lynnfield Road Memphis Tennessee 38119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'Neill, Andrew J. 2059 Ambergate Lane No. 7, Cordova Shelby, Tennessee / US | [1996/46] | Representative(s) | Howick, Nicholas Keith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Howick, Nicholas Keith, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1996/46] | Howick, Nicholas Keith CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96303227.1 | 08.05.1996 | [1996/46] | Priority number, date | US19950436919 | 08.05.1995 Original published format: US 436919 | [1996/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742629 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742629 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/115, H02G15/192, H02G15/117 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
H02G15/007 (EP,US);
H02G15/105 (EP,US);
H02G15/115 (EP,US);
H02G15/117 (EP,US);
H02G15/18 (EP,US);
H02G15/192 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/46] | Title | German: | Zum Spritzgiessverkapseln geeignete Kabelmuffe für einen langgestreckten Kabelspleiss | [1999/04] | English: | Forced encapsulation enclosure for an elongate cable splice | [1996/46] | French: | Enveloppe à enrobage forcé pour jonction allongée de câbles | [1996/46] |
Former [1996/46] | Umhüllung mit gezwungenem Vergiessen für einen langgestreckten Kabelspleiss | Examination procedure | 25.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/26] | 12.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 29.09.1999 | CH | 29.09.1999 | LI | 29.09.1999 | NL | 29.09.1999 | SE | 29.09.1999 | [2003/09] |
Former [2002/23] | BE | 29.09.1999 | |
CH | 29.09.1999 | ||
LI | 29.09.1999 | ||
SE | 29.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | BE | 29.09.1999 | |
CH | 29.09.1999 | ||
LI | 29.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 29.09.1999 | |
CH | 03.01.2000 | ||
LI | 03.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/24] | BE | 29.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2247253 (BARENBLATT MORRIS) [A] 1,6 * figures 1,2; claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP0240295 (BOWTHORPE HELLERMANN LTD [GB]) [A] 1,6 * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 20; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4742181 (DIENES ZOLTAN B [US]) [A] 1,6 * figure 12 *; | [AD]EP0538009 (THOMAS & BETTS CORP [US]) [AD] 1,6 * abstract *; | [PX]WO9523449 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [PX] 1,6 * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 2; figures 11-14 * |