EP0748094 - Adjustment of call bandwidth during a communication call [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T IPM Corp. 2333 Ponce de Leon Boulevard Coral Gables Florida 33134 / US | [2006/10] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states AT&T IPM Corp. 2333 Ponce de Leon Boulevard Coral Gables, Florida 33134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bales, Bruce Merill 493 Muirfield Court Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US | 02 /
Thieler, Stephen Max 4465 Apple Way Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [1996/50] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 96303306.3 | 13.05.1996 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | US19950451282 | 26.05.1995 Original published format: US 451282 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0748094 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0748094 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0748094 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04Q11/04 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0428 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13176 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13201 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13216 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13248 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/50] | Title | German: | Anrufbandbreiteneinstellung während eines Kommunikationsanrufs | [2005/40] | English: | Adjustment of call bandwidth during a communication call | [1996/50] | French: | Ajustement de la bande passante pendant un appel de communication | [1996/50] |
Former [1996/50] | Anrufbandbreiteseinstellung während eines Kommunikationsanrufs | Examination procedure | 05.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 27.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 08.03.2006 | ES | 19.06.2006 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/50] | ES | 19.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5058133 (DUNCANSON JAY P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9 * column 3, line 39 - line 64 * * column 4, line 18 - line 25 * * column 6, line 20 - line 35 * * column 9, line 59 - column 10, line 9 * * column 10, line 34 - column 63 * * figures 1,11 *; | [A]EP0583094 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 21 * * column 2, line 45 - line 55 * * column 3, line 15 - line 54 * * column 4, line 5 - line 9 * * column 7, line 21 - line 25 * * column 8, line 47 - column 9, line 56 *; | [A]US4996685 (FARESE THOMAS R [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 13 * * column 8, line 6 - line 19 * * column 9, line 68 - column 10, line 4 * * column 10, line 19 - line 22 * |