EP0745907 - Toner with two crosslinked polyesters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [1996/49] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chow, She C. 286 Valley Green Drive Penfield NY 14526 / US | [1996/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/49] | Johnson, Reginald George, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96303705.6 | 23.05.1996 | [1996/49] | Priority number, date | US19950453177 | 30.05.1995 Original published format: US 453177 | [1996/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0745907 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0745907 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/087 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
G03G9/08755 (EP,US);
G03G9/081 (EP,US);
G03G9/08797 (EP,US);
Y10S430/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/49] | Title | German: | Toner mit zwei vernetzten Polyesterharzen | [1996/49] | English: | Toner with two crosslinked polyesters | [1996/49] | French: | Révélateur contenant deux polyesters réticulés | [1996/49] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/32] | 22.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5057392 (MCCABE JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * example - *; | [X]EP0495475 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,8,9 * the whole document *; | [PX]US5500324 (MAHABADI HADI K [CA], et al) [PX] 1,8,9 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0495476 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,8,9 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP0662640 (CANON KK [JP]) [PX] 1 * page 19 *; | [X]US4863824 (UCHIDA MASAFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5227460 (MAHABADI HADI K [CA], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |