EP0748085 - Local communication network for power reduction and enhanced reliability in a multiple node tracking system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Welles II, Kenneth Brakeley 104 Hetcheltown Road Scotia, New York 12302 / US | 02 /
Chennakeshu, Sandeep (NMN) 204-H Hyde Park Court Cary, North Carolina 27513 / US | 03 /
Tiemann, Jerome Johnson 234 Union Street Schenectady, New York 12305 / US | 04 /
Tomlinson, Harold Woodruff, Jr. 1001 Arapaho Path Scotia, New York 12302 / US | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1996/50] | Matthews, Graham Farrah, et al London Patent Operation, GE International Inc, Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96303834.4 | 29.05.1996 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | US19950484750 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 484750 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0748085 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0748085 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, G08G1/127, G01S5/14, B61L25/02 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
H04W84/20 (EP,US);
B61L25/021 (EP,US);
B61L25/025 (EP,US);
G01S5/0027 (EP,US);
G08G1/127 (EP,US);
B61L2205/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [1996/50] | Title | German: | Lokales Kommunikationsnetz für Leistungsreduzierung und erhöhter Zuverlässigkeit in einer Ortungsanlage mit mehreren Knoten | [2003/10] | English: | Local communication network for power reduction and enhanced reliability in a multiple node tracking system | [1996/50] | French: | Réseau de communication local pour réduction de la puissance et fiabilité renforcée dans un système de localisation à noeuds multiples | [1996/50] |
Former [1996/50] | Lokales Kommunikationsnetz für Leistungsreduzierung und erhöhter Zuverlässigkeit in einer Ordnungsanlage mit mehreren Knoten | Examination procedure | 11.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/33] | 23.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 11.05.2004 | [2004/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4682326 (ULUG MEHMET E [US]) [A] 1-12* column A; claim - *; | [A]WO9415413 (NORAND CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5355511 (HATANO RIKUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column W * |