EP0749111 - Codebook searching techniques for speech processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.2002 [2002/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T IPM Corp. 2333 Ponce de Leon Boulevard Coral Gables Florida 33134 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states AT&T IPM Corp. 2333 Ponce de Leon Boulevard Coral Gables, Florida 33134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nahumi, Dror 49 Stonehenge Drive Ocean, New Jersey 07712 / US | [1996/51] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 96304019.1 | 04.06.1996 | [1996/51] | Priority number, date | US19950518354 | 14.06.1995 Original published format: US 518354 | [1996/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0749111 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0749111 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | [1998/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0749111 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/10, G10L19/12 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
G10L19/10 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/51] | G10L9/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/51] | Title | German: | Kodebuch-Suchverfahren für die Sprachverarbeitung | [1996/51] | English: | Codebook searching techniques for speech processing | [1996/51] | French: | Procédés de recherche dans un dictionnaire pour le traitement de la parole | [1996/51] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/53] | 27.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5339384 (CHEN JUIN-HWEY [US]) [DA] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [03.9] *; | [A]GB2238696 (COMMUNICATIONS SATELLITE CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0307122 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1 | [A] - MAUC M ET AL, "Complexity reduction for FS-1016 with multistage search", ICASSP-94. 1994 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (CAT. NO.94CH3387-8), PROCEEDINGS OF ICASSP '94. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, ADELAIDE, SA, AUSTRALIA, 19-22 APRIL 1, ISBN 0-7803-1775-0, 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages I/261 - 4 vol.1, XP000529395 [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US3624302 | US4701954 |