EP0747149 - Investment casting method yielding cast articles with enhanced surface finish [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON PROFESSIONAL Inc. 325 Paramount Drive, P.O. Box 350 Raynham Massachusetts 02767-0350 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON PROFESSIONAL Inc. 325 Paramount Drive, P.O. Box 350 Raynham, Massachusetts 02767-0350 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oti, James 3 Heaton Circle Franklin, Massachusetts 02038 / US | 02 /
Lasalle, David 716 Knollwood Drive Woonsocket, Rhode Island 02895 / US | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96304194.2 | 06.06.1996 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | US19950481049 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 481049 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0747149 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0747149 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | [1998/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0747149 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B22C7/02, B22C9/04 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
B22C9/043 (EP);
B22C7/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/50] | Title | German: | Feingiessverfahren zur Erzeugung von Gegenständen mit sehr präziser Oberfläche | [1996/50] | English: | Investment casting method yielding cast articles with enhanced surface finish | [1996/50] | French: | Procédé de coulée de précision donnant des objets à état de surface de haute précision | [1996/50] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0649691 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4556528 (GERSCH HERBERT M ET AL) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 55 - line 62; claim - *; | [Y]JPS6418546 ; | [A]DE3225980 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG) [A] 2 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890509), vol. 013, no. 193, Database accession no. (M - 822), & JP01018546 A 19890123 (MORIKAWA SANGYO KK) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * |