EP0750260 - Checkpoint processing in a multiprocessor computer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-0913 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoshina, Satoshi, c/o Intell. Prop. Div. Toshiba Corp., 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sakai, Hiroshi, c/o Intell. Prop. Div. Toshiba Corp., 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kirayama, Hideaki, c/o Intell. Prop. Div. Toshiba Corp., 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Omori, Msasi, c/o Intell. Prop. Div. Toshiba Corp., 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Masubuchi, Yoshio, c/o Intell. Prop. Div. Toshiba Corp., 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Fujii, Takahiro, c/o Intell. Prop. Div. Toshiba Corp., 1-1-1, Shibaura Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [1996/52] | BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96304434.2 | 13.06.1996 | [1996/52] | Priority number, date | JP19950151735 | 19.06.1995 Original published format: JP 15173595 | JP19950341839 | 27.12.1995 Original published format: JP 34183995 | [1996/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0750260 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0750260 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
G06F11/1458 (EP,US);
G06F11/14 (KR);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F12/0806 (EP,US);
G06F2201/82 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/52] | Title | German: | Prüfpunktverarbeitung in einem Multiprozessorrechner | [1996/52] | English: | Checkpoint processing in a multiprocessor computer | [1996/52] | French: | Traîtement de point de contrôle dans un ordinateur multiprocesseur | [1996/52] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/52] | 01.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/28] | 05.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0607660 (INT COMPUTERS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,9,15,19-22 * abstract *; | [A] - KUN-LUNG WU ET AL, "ERROR RECOVERY IN SHARED MEMORY MULTIPROCESSORS USING PRIVATE CACHES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, (19900401), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 231 - 240, XP000133938 [A] 1,9,15,19-22 * abstract * * page 232, column L, line 40 - page 233, column R, line 39 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/71.80134 | [A] - SOSIC R, "HISTORY CACHE: HARDWARE SUPPORT FOR REVERSE EXECUTION", COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE NEWS, (199412), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 11 - 18, XP000489703 [A] 1,9,15,19-22 * page 12, column L, line 36 - page 13, column R, line 22 * * page 14, column R, line 10 - line 46 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/192537.192541 |