EP0749117 - Recording and/or reproduction apparatus and method for optical record medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsutsui, Keiichi c/o Sony Corp., 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Igarashi, Katsuji c/o Sony Corp., 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [1996/51] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96304452.4 | 14.06.1996 | [1996/51] | Priority number, date | JP19950149899 | 16.06.1995 Original published format: JP 14989995 | [1996/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0749117 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0749117 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | [1998/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0749117 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09 | [1996/51] | CPC: |
G11B7/007 (KR);
G11B7/094 (EP,US);
G11B7/0945 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0013 (EP,US);
G11B7/0908 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/51] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zur Aufzeichnung auf ein optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium und/oder Wiedergabe von einem optischen Aufzeichnungsmedium | [1996/51] | English: | Recording and/or reproduction apparatus and method for optical record medium | [1996/51] | French: | Appareil et procédé d'enregistrement et/ou lecture d'un milieu d'enregistrement optique | [1996/51] | Examination procedure | 15.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 14.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4823330 (ARTER NELSON K [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,12-14,16,18 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 15; figure 1 * * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 67; figures 5,6 * [Y] 9-11,19-21; | [X]US5351224 (NAGATA SHIZUO [JP], et al) [X] 4,15 * column 5, line 3 - line 39; figures 1,2 * * column 15, line 1 - column 17, line 31; figures 4,13,14,18 *; | [X]JPH02187930 ; | [X]EP0609882 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 6,17 * abstract * * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 2; figure 10 *; | [Y]US5263011 (MAEDA MASATAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 9-11,19-21 * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 57; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP0521619 (IBM [US]) [Y] 9,10,19,20 * column 11, line 57 - column 12, line 23; figure 9 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901015), vol. 014, no. 472, Database accession no. (P - 1116), & JP02187930 A 19900724 (SONY CORP) [X] 6,17 * abstract * |