EP0759284 - A wrist-worn pulse wave measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 1-8, Nakase, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken 261 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 1-8, Nakase, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken 261 / JP | |||
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-08 / JP | ||
For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 1-8, Nakase, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken 261 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasukawa, Naoaki, c/o Seiko Epson Corp. 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, 392 / JP | 02 /
Hayakawa, Motomu, c/o Seiko Epson Corp. 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, 392 / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Chiaki, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 1-8, Nakase Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken, 261 / JP | [2003/04] |
Former [1997/09] | 01 /
Yasukawa, Naokaki, c/o Seiko Epson Corp. 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, 392 / JP | ||
02 /
Hayakawa, Motomu, c/o Seiko Epson Corp. 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, 392 / JP | |||
03 /
Nakamura, Chiaki, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 1-8, Nakase Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken, 261 / JP | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96304758.4 | 27.06.1996 | [1997/09] | Priority number, date | JP19950166551 | 30.06.1995 Original published format: JP 16655195 | JP19960143341 | 05.06.1996 Original published format: JP 14334196 | [1997/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0759284 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0759284 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0759284 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/024, A61B5/00 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
A61B5/02438 (EP,US);
A61B5/02427 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/09] | A61B5/024 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/09] | Title | German: | Am Handgelenk tragbare Vorrichtung zur Messung von Pulswellen | [2002/36] | English: | A wrist-worn pulse wave measuring device | [1997/09] | French: | Dispositif porté au poignet pour la mesure du pouls | [2002/36] |
Former [1997/09] | AM Handgelenk tragbare Vorrichtung zur Messung von Pulswellen | ||
Former [1997/09] | Dispositif porté au poignet pour la mesure de propagation du pouls | Examination procedure | 03.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/32] | 06.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2579791 (BRUNET PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]FR2583282 (CREUSOT INST UNIVERS TECHNOL [FR]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 9, line 16 - line 31; figures 1,4 *; | [A]WO8905116 (AMERICAN HEALTH PROD INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 8 *; | [A]EP0542413 (STUART MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]WO9413198 (SIEMENS MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-4* abstract *; | [A]EP0653182 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |