EP0751215 - Culture vessel for use with coverslips [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grushkin-Lerner, Leslie S. 21 Notre Dame Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [1997/01] | Representative(s) | Ruffles, Graham Keith Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | Ruffles, Graham Keith MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96304760.0 | 27.06.1996 | [1997/01] | Priority number, date | US19950496593 | 29.06.1995 Original published format: US 496593 | [1997/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0751215 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0751215 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/22 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
C12M25/06 (EP);
C12M23/10 (EP);
C12M23/12 (EP);
C12M23/20 (EP);
C12M23/22 (EP);
C12M23/38 (EP);
C12M25/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1997/01] | C12M1/20, C12M1/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/01] | Title | German: | Kulturgefäss zum Gebrauch mit Kulturplatten | [1997/01] | English: | Culture vessel for use with coverslips | [1997/01] | French: | Récipient de culture pour utilisation avec des plaquettes de culture | [1997/01] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/26] | 23.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3816264 (WINTER W ET AL) [X] 1-5,10,11 * figure - * [Y] 12; | [XY]US3902972 (BECKFORD ORVILLE A) [X] 1 * figure - * [Y] 12; | [XY]US4945061 (ISKANDER EZZAT) [X] 1,5,10,11 * figure -; claim - * [Y] 12; | [XY]US4255522 (FUSENIG NORBERT ET AL) [X] 1,5,11 [Y] 12; | [Y]US2361992 (A. CANTOR) [Y] 5-12 * column 2, line 36 - line 50; figure - *; | [XY]JPH0632345 ; | [Y]US2874091 (R. T. FISK) [Y] 12 * figure -; claim - * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940511), vol. 018, no. 245, Database accession no. (M - 1603), & JP06032345 A 19940208 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,2,5-8,11 * abstract * [Y] 5-12 |