EP0755044 - Device and method for driving liquid crystal display with precharge of display data lines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/04] | Device and method for driving liquid crystal display with precharge pf display data lines | ||
[2003/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
Former [1997/04] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Enami, Kunio 1-4 Ohta-ku, Yasu-cho Yasu-gun, Shiga-ken / JP | 02 /
Tomooka, Takatoshi 665-1 Toba Otsu, Yasu-cho Yasu-gun, Shiga-ken / JP | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Ling, Christopher John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Ling, Christopher John IBM United Kingdom Limited, intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 96304946.5 | 04.07.1996 | [1997/04] | Priority number, date | JP19950181389 | 18.07.1995 Original published format: JP 18138995 | [1997/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0755044 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0755044 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
G02F1/133 (KR);
G09G3/3688 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0248 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0251 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0297 (EP,US);
G09G2330/023 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Steuerung einer Flüssigkristallanzeige mit Vorladen von Anzeigedatenleitungen | [1997/04] | English: | Device and method for driving liquid crystal display with precharge of display data lines | [2003/05] | French: | Appareil et méthode d'attaque d'affichage à cristaux liquides avec précharge des lignes de données d'affichage | [1997/04] |
Former [1997/04] | Device and method for driving liquid crystal display with precharge pf display data lines | Examination procedure | 21.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/30] | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9410676 (YUEN FOONG YU H K CO LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,8-11,14 * Abstract *; page 8, line 35 - page 13, line 18; figures 2-5 * * page 15, line 13 - line 19 * [Y] 5,13; | [Y]EP0241562 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [Y] 5,13 * Abstract *; page 9, line 14 - page 10, line 13; figures 1-4 * * page 11, line 8 - page 12, line 13 *; | [A]DE4315819 (PLANAR INTERNATIONAL OY LTD [FI]) [A] 4,12 * Abstract *; column 1, line 47 - line 59; figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 17 - column 4, line 20 *; | [A]JPH07121139 ; | [XP]EP0678849 (SONY CORP [JP]) [XP] 1,3,6,8,9,11,14 * Abstract*; column 5, line 40 - column 7, line 55; figures 1-4,6 * * column 8, line 35 - column 9, line 5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 95, no. 8, & JP07121139 A 19950512 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO.) [A] 7,15 * abstract * |