EP0752490 - Circular knitting machine with jacquard pattern control mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRECISION FUKUHARA WORKS, LTD 1-5, Honjo-cho 1-chome, Higashinada-ku Kobe Hyogo 658 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states PRECISION FUKUHARA WORKS, LTD 1-5, Honjo-cho 1-chome, Higashinada-ku Kobe, Hyogo 658 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yorisue, Shozo 108-405 Miyasaka Aza Suisha-Shiden Nada-ku Kobe, Hyogo 657 / JP | 02 /
Shibata, Takao 2-25 Tenno-cho Takatsuki Osaka 569 / JP | 03 /
Hashihiro, Shinji 4-23 Konan-cho 4-chome Higashinada-ku Kobe Hyogo 658 / JP | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 96304953.1 | 04.07.1996 | [1997/02] | Priority number, date | JP19950192439 | 04.07.1995 Original published format: JP 19243995 | JP19950287863 | 09.10.1995 Original published format: JP 28786395 | [1997/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0752490 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752490 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | D04B15/78 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
D04B15/68 (EP,US);
D04B15/06 (EP,US);
D04B15/34 (EP,US);
D04B15/78 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1997/02] | Title | German: | Rundstrickmaschine mit Jacquardmustersteuervorrichtung | [1997/02] | English: | Circular knitting machine with jacquard pattern control mechanism | [1997/02] | French: | Métier à tricoter circulaire comportant un mécanisme de contrôle de dessin Jacquard | [1997/02] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 20.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR1368366 (BEGUIN ET AL) [X] 1,5,10 * page 4, column L, line 49 - page 5, column L, line 25; figures 10-14 * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]EP0629727 (TEXTILES PLASTIQUES CHOMARAT [FR]) [Y] 2-4 * page 4, line 15 - line 36; figure 4 *; | [DA]JPS62299554 (HEIKOU SEISAKUSHO KK); | EP0249203 [ ] (HEIKO SEISAKUSHO [JP]); | [DA]US5375436 (FUCIK MILAN [CS]) |