EP0756237 - Group environment setting method and system thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurosawa, Takahiro c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sato, Hiroaki c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/05] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96305355.8 | 22.07.1996 | [1997/05] | Priority number, date | JP19950184199 | 20.07.1995 Original published format: JP 18419995 | JP19960006549 | 18.01.1996 Original published format: JP 654996 | [1997/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0756237 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0756237 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99938 (US);
Y10S707/99939 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/05] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Zuweisung von Gruppenumgebungsvariablen | [1997/05] | English: | Group environment setting method and system thereof | [1997/05] | French: | Procédé et système de définition de l'environnement d'un groupe | [1997/05] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/33] | 16.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Request for further processing for: | 27.04.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 27.04.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 25.09.2002 | DE | 28.12.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/46] | DE | 28.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - PRASUN DEWAN ET AL, "PRIMITIVES FOR PROGRAMMING MULTI-USER INTERFACES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOL ( UIST ), HILTON HEAD, S. CAROLINA, NOV. 11 - 13, 1991, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, (19911111), no. SYMP. 4, pages 69 - 78, XP000315068 [Y] 1-56 * page 74, column R, line 5 - page 75, column R, line 22 * | [Y] - HONGHAI SHEN ET AL, "ACCESS CONTROL FOR COLLABORATIVE ENVIRONMENTS", SHARING PERSPECTIVES, TORONTO, OCT. 31 - NOV. 4, 1992, TURNER J;KRAUT J, (19921031), no. -, pages 51 - 58, XP000337568 [Y] 1-56 * the whole document * |