EP0755656 - One-way suture retaining device for braided sutures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | [1997/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenman, Daniel C. 216 Grand Blvd., Apt. 2 San Mateo, CA 94401 08889 / US | 02 /
Hill, Donald G. 1 Atno Avenue Hopatcong, NJ 07843 / US | [1997/05] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96305501.7 | 26.07.1996 | [1997/05] | Priority number, date | US19950508600 | 28.07.1995 Original published format: US 508600 | [1997/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0755656 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0755656 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | [1997/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0755656 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04, A61L31/00, A61F2/08 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
A61B17/0487 (EP,US);
A61B17/0469 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0451 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3052 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/05] | Title | German: | Einweg-Nähfadenhaltevorrichtung für geflochtene Nähfaden | [1997/05] | English: | One-way suture retaining device for braided sutures | [1997/05] | French: | Dispositif unidirectionnel de retenue de fil de suture pour fils de suture tressés | [1997/05] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/16] | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5391173 (WILK PETER J [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 2 * * column 5, line 10 - line 28; figures 1,2D,4,7,8 * [Y] 2,4; | [YA]EP0591991 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [Y] 2,4 * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 7; figure -; claim 13 * [A] 1,3; | [A]US5413585 (PAGEDAS ANTHONY C [US]) [A] 1,3 * column A; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]EP0634142 (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 4 * column 5, line 4 - line 15 *; | [A]US5258015 (LI LEHMANN K [US], et al); | [A]WO9516398 (ETHICON INC [US]) |