EP0768082 - Stable gelatin coated aspirin tablets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 345 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patell, Mahesh 4 Farrington Street Edison, New Jersey 08820 / US | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1997/16] | Cropp, John Anthony David, et al MATHYS & SQUIRE 100 Grays Inn Road London, WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96305519.9 | 26.07.1996 | [1997/16] | Priority number, date | US19950508647 | 28.07.1995 Original published format: US 508647 | [1997/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0768082 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0768082 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K47/42, A61K31/60 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
A61K31/616 (EP,US);
A61K9/2068 (EP,US);
A61K9/2886 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/16] | Extension states | AL | 03.08.1996 | LT | 03.08.1996 | LV | 03.08.1996 | SI | 03.08.1996 | Title | German: | Stabile, gelatinüberzogene Aspirintabletten | [1997/16] | English: | Stable gelatin coated aspirin tablets | [1997/16] | French: | Tablettes d'aspirine stabilisées, enrobées de gélatine | [1997/16] | Examination procedure | 25.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 05.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 14.11.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4517173 (KIZAWA HIDENORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 *cf. abstract, col. 2, summary, claims*; | [DA]US4716042 (BLANK ROBERT G [US], et al) [DA] 1-12 *cf. abstract, col. 1, field of invention, claim 1*; | [A]US4775536 (PATELL MAHESH K [US]) [A] 1-12 *cf. abstract, claims*; | [A]US4900559 (PATELL MAHESH K [US]) [A] 1-12*cf. abstract, col. 1, lines 5-35, claims* |