EP0757331 - Image processing method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Makoto Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1997/06] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96305528.0 | 29.07.1996 | [1997/06] | Priority number, date | JP19950194941 | 31.07.1995 Original published format: JP 19494195 | JP19960183826 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: JP 18382696 | [1997/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0757331 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0757331 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | [1998/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0757331 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/20, G09G3/36 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
G06T5/20 (EP,US);
G06T7/20 (KR);
G06T7/254 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/06] | G06T7/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Bildverarbeitung | [1997/06] | English: | Image processing method and apparatus | [1997/06] | French: | Appareil et méthode de traitement d'image | [1997/06] | Examination procedure | 23.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/39] | 06.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.03.2004 | IT | 03.03.2004 | NL | 03.03.2004 | DE | 04.06.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 03.03.2004 | |
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | NL | 03.03.2004 | |
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | NL | 03.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0608053 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * page 19, line 47 - line 54 *; | [A]EP0608056 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * |