EP0762078 - Apparatus and method for measuring the thickness of the layers of a multi-layer transparent film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/11] | System for determining the thickness and index of refraction of a film | ||
[2006/47] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Venkatesh, Shalini 1078 Pomeroy Avenue Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | 02 /
Heffner, Brian L. 1449 Topar Avenue Los Altos, California 94024 / US | 03 /
Sorin, Wayne V. 3579 Cambridge Lane Mountain View, California 94040 / US | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams, Powell & Associates, 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 96305828.4 | 08.08.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | US19950520198 | 28.08.1995 Original published format: US 520198 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0762078 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0762078 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/06, G01N21/41 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
G01N21/41 (EP,US);
G01B11/0675 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Messung der Dicke der Schichten einer transparenten Mehrschichtfilmstruktur | [2006/47] | English: | Apparatus and method for measuring the thickness of the layers of a multi-layer transparent film | [2006/47] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de mesure de l'épaisseur des couches d'une structure multicouche en film transparente | [2006/47] |
Former [1997/11] | System zum Determinieren der Dicke und des Bruchungsindexes eines Dünnfilms | ||
Former [1997/11] | System for determining the thickness and index of refraction of a film | ||
Former [1997/11] | Système pour la détermination de l'épaisseur et de l'indice de réfraction d'une pellicule | Examination procedure | 04.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 24.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 16.12.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 23.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/42] | Appeal following examination | 09.02.2004 | Appeal received No. T0603/04 | 13.04.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.04.2003 | Appeal received | 23.06.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.07.2003 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4647205 (KALLIOMAEKI KALEVI J [FI], et al) [X] 1,5,6,10 * abstract * * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 26; figure 3 *; | [A]US5341205 (MCLANDRICH MATTHEW N [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X] - SORIN W V ET AL, "SIMULTANEOUS THICKNESS AND GROUP INDEX MEASUREMENT USING OPTICAL LOW-COHERENCE REFLECTOMETRY", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (19920101), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 105 - 107, XP000244587 [X] 1,3,5,6,8,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.124892 | [A] - FLOURNOY P A ET AL, "WHITE-LIGHT INTERFEROMETRIC THICKNESS GAUGE", APPLIED OPTICS, (197209), vol. 11, no. 9, pages 1907 - 1915, XP002027922 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.11.001907 | [A] - GEERKENS J ET AL, "INTERFEROMETRIE MIT LICHT KURZER KOHARENZLANGE ZUR ABSOLUTEN MESSUNG VON ABSTANDEN UND DICKEN", MICROTECNIC, (19940101), no. 4, pages 8 - 10, XP000495354 [A] 1 * page 9, column M, line 24 - page 10, column R, line 8; figure 4 * |