EP0762327 - Apparatus and methods for performing electronic scene analysis and enhancement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1997/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jagadish, Hosagrahar Visvesvaraya 16 Beech Avenue Berkeley Heights, New Jersey 07922 / US | 02 /
Petajan, Eric David 22 Maple Street Watchung, New Jersey 07060 / US | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 96306222.9 | 28.08.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | US19950525932 | 08.09.1995 Original published format: US 525932 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0762327 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T7/60 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
G06V10/147 (EP,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
G06T5/00 (EP,US);
G06T7/55 (EP,US);
H04N13/128 (EP,US);
G06V2201/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/11] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zur Durchführung einer elektronischen Szenenanalyse und -verbesserung | [1997/11] | English: | Apparatus and methods for performing electronic scene analysis and enhancement | [1997/11] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour accomplir l'analyse et l'amélioration électroniques d'une scène | [1997/11] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 03.11.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |