|
25.04.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
21 |
|
05.10.2009 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
06.07.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.04.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
232 |
|
20.04.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.04.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
25 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.04.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
42 |
|
26.11.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
560 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
726 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
28 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
56 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
114 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2003 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2003 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2003 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.05.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.05.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.05.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.11.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
100 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.10.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.12.2000 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2000 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.1999 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.1999 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
17.10.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1997 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1997 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.1997 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.1997 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of designation fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.1996 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.1996 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.1996 |
Invitation to pay filing fee/search fee with additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1996 |
Invitation to pay claims fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
28.10.1996 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
110 |
|
25.09.1996 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |