EP0766171 - Information handling system including efficient power on initialization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.1999 [1999/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaiser, John M. 204 Capulin Mt. Cedar Park, Texas 78613 / US | 02 /
Maule, Warren E. 12131 Taku Road Cedar Park, Texas 78613 / US | [1997/14] | Representative(s) | Zerbi, Guido Maria Intellectual Property Department IBM United Kingdom Ltd. Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | Zerbi, Guido Maria Intellectual Property Department, IBM United Kingdom Ltd., Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 96306529.7 | 09.09.1996 | [1997/14] | Priority number, date | US19950537174 | 29.09.1995 Original published format: US 537174 | [1997/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0766171 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
G06F9/4406 (EP,US);
G06F1/24 (KR);
G06F8/54 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/14] | Title | German: | Informationsbearbeitungssystem mit effizienter Einschaltungsinitialisierung | [1997/14] | English: | Information handling system including efficient power on initialization | [1997/14] | French: | Système de traitement d'information avec initialisation efficace après sa mise sous tension | [1997/14] | Examination procedure | 29.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 13.11.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0364127 (INT COMPUTERS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3 * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 24; figure 1 *; | [A]US4491914 (SUJAKU JIRO [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 21 * | [A] - "LOGICAL IPL SELECTION MECHANISM", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, (198607), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 491 - 493, XP002022222 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | [A] - "METHOD TO READ BOOTSTRAP RECORD FROM UNKNOWN FORMATTED DEVICE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (198805), vol. 30, no. 12, pages 67 - 70, XP000021494 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * |