EP0761871 - Kraft recovery boiler furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Mead Corporation Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states THE MEAD CORPORATION Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LeGault, Timothy A. 908 Dakota Avenue Gladstone, Michigan 49837 / US | 02 /
Fornetti, Michael A. 6821 M. 75 Road Escabana, Michigan 49829 / US | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Deans, Michael John Percy, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Deans, Michael John Percy, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 96306596.6 | 11.09.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | US19950526172 | 11.09.1995 Original published format: US 526172 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0761871 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0761871 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D21C11/12 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
D21C11/12 (EP,US);
F22B31/045 (EP,US);
F23C5/00 (EP,US);
F23C7/02 (EP,US);
F23G7/04 (EP,US);
Y02E20/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/11] | Title | German: | Kessel und Ofen zur Rückgewinnung im Kraftverfahren | [1997/11] | English: | Kraft recovery boiler furnace | [1997/11] | French: | Chaudière et four de récupération dans le procédé Kraft | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 23.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.12.2001 | BE | 12.12.2001 | CH | 12.12.2001 | GR | 12.12.2001 | IT | 12.12.2001 | LI | 12.12.2001 | NL | 12.12.2001 | DK | 12.03.2002 | PT | 12.03.2002 | ES | 27.06.2002 | IE | 11.09.2002 | LU | 11.09.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
DK | 12.03.2002 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
IE | 11.09.2002 | ||
LU | 11.09.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
DK | 12.03.2002 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
IE | 11.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
DK | 12.03.2002 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
IE | 11.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
IE | 11.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 12.12.2001 | |
BE | 12.12.2001 | ||
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 12.12.2001 | |
CH | 12.12.2001 | ||
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
NL | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 12.12.2001 | |
GR | 12.12.2001 | ||
LI | 12.12.2001 | ||
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 12.12.2001 | |
PT | 12.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | PT | 12.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4940004 (JANSEN JOHAN H [US]); | [A]US5007354 (UPPSTU ERIK [FI]); | [DA]US5121700 (BLACKWELL BRIAN R [CA], et al); | [X]WO9216688 (GOETAVERKEN ENERGY AB [SE]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10,12,14,16 * page 3 - page 7 *; | [A]WO9305228 (GOETAVERKEN ENERGY AB [SE]) [A] 7,15 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5305698 (BLACKWELL BRIAN R [CA], et al); | [XA]WO9412829 (POLYREC AB OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,12,14 *abstract; figure 8* * the whole document * [A] 4-7,10,15,16; | [PX]WO9535409 (KVAERNER PULPING TECH [SE], et al) [PX] 1,2,5-7,10-12,14,16 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [PA]US5551354 (CROFUT STANTON A [US], et al) [PA] 3 * column 1, line 5 - column 1, line 23 * |