EP0764717 - Agglomerated active with controlled release [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2001 [2001/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Warwick International Group Limited Mostyn Holywell Flintshire CH8 9HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states Warwick International Group Limited Mostyn Holywell, Flintshire CH8 9HE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Withenshaw, John David Orchard House, Maes-y-llan, Flint Road Northop, CH7 6BR / GB | 02 /
Chadwick, Mark Ardern 12 Maes-y-dyffryn Greenfield, CH8 7QR / GB | 03 /
Wilson, William John 44 Roxburgh Avenue, Higher Tranmere Birkenhead, Wirral, L42 6QD / GB | [1997/19] |
Former [1997/13] | 01 /
WITHENSHAW, John David Orchard House, Maes-y-llan, Flint Road Northop, CH7 6BR / GB | ||
02 /
CHADWICK, Mark Ardern 12 Maes-y-dyffryn Greenfield, CH8 7QR / GB | |||
03 /
WILSON, William John 44 Roxburgh Avenue, Higher Tranmere Birkenhead, Wirral, L42 6QD / GB | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96306796.2 | 18.09.1996 | [1997/13] | Priority number, date | GB19950019094 | 19.09.1995 Original published format: GB 9519094 | [1997/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0764717 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, C11D3/39, C11D11/00, C11D17/06 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
C11D3/3753 (EP,US);
C11D11/0082 (EP,US);
C11D3/3917 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/13] | Title | German: | Agglomerierter Wirkstoff mit kontrollierter Freigabe | [1997/13] | English: | Agglomerated active with controlled release | [1997/13] | French: | Agent aggloméré à libération contrôlée | [1997/13] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 25.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/43] | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPS4751562B ; | [X]GB1248994 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 37 * * claims 1,7,8 *; | [X]US3781228 (MCDONNELL R, et al) [X] 1-3 * column W *; | [DA]US3823090 (KAME M, et al) [DA] 1 * column 2, line 48 - line 51 * * claim - *; | [A]US4009113 (GREEN ROBIN JOHN, et al) [A] 1-4 * claims 1,6,7,13,15,16 *; | [A]EP0374867 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 53 * * claim - *; | [A]US5164195 (LEW CHEL W [US]) [A] 1-3 * claim - *; | [A]DE4232494 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1,10-12 * * page 8, line 6 - line 20 *; | [DA]WO9415010 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [DA] 1,4,5* claims 1-3,13 *; | US5458801 [ ] (OYASHIKI TOMONORI [JP], et al) [ ] * column 9, line 22 - column 10, line 22 * * claims 1,6,7,15-20 *; | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 73, no. 01, Database accession no. 73-01235U, XP002001561 & JPS4751562B B1 00000000 (LION FAT AND OIL CO. LTD.) [DA] 1-3 * abstract * |