EP0764713 - Liquid crystal device and liquid crystal apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, DE, IT, LI | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinjo, Kenji, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sato, Koichi, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Terada, Masahiro, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Yamada, Syuji, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96306820.0 | 19.09.1996 | [1997/13] | Priority number, date | JP19950264625 | 20.09.1995 Original published format: JP 26462595 | JP19950264633 | 20.09.1995 Original published format: JP 26463395 | [1997/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0764713 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0764713 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09K19/58, G02F1/1337 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
C09K19/04 (EP,US);
C09K19/582 (EP,US);
G02F1/13 (KR);
G02F1/1337 (KR);
G02F1/133711 (EP,US);
C09K2323/0271 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/13] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallvorrichtung und Flüssigkristallapparat | [1997/13] | English: | Liquid crystal device and liquid crystal apparatus | [1997/13] | French: | Dispositif à cristaux liquides et appareil à cristaux liquides | [1997/13] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 11.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 18.07.2001 | FR | 18.07.2001 | IT | 18.07.2001 | LI | 18.07.2001 | NL | 18.07.2001 | SE | 18.10.2001 | DE | 19.10.2001 | ES | 31.01.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/35] | FR | 18.07.2001 | |
NL | 18.07.2001 | ||
SE | 18.10.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 18.07.2001 | |
SE | 18.10.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 18.07.2001 | |
SE | 18.10.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/18] | SE | 18.10.2001 | |
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 18.10.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0641850 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,5,7-10,13 * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 1 * * example - *; | [DA]EP0442499 (CANON KK [JP]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0682098 (CANON KK [JP]) [PA] 1,3-10,13-22,25,26 * page 83, line 21 - page 87, line 26 * * page 88, line 26 - page 89, line 3 * * claim - * |