EP0764767 - Combined cycle power plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-8572 / JP | ||
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohtomo, Fumio, c/o K.K. Toshiba Intell. Prop. Div, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Nakata, Yuji, c/o K.K. Toshiba Intell. Prop. Div, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
Fukuyama, Yoshitaka, c/o K.K. Toshiba Intell. Prop. Div, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 04 /
Inomata, Asako, c/o K.K. Toshiba Intell. Prop. Div, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 05 /
Shibuya, Sachio, c/o K.K. Toshiba Intell. Prop. Div, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 06 /
Koga, Akinori, c/o K.K. Toshiba Intell. Prop. Div, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 07 /
Ishii, Junji, c/o K.K. Toshiba Intell. Prop. Div, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 08 /
Ito, Shoko, c/o K.K. Toshiba Intell. Prop. Div, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 09 /
Yamamoto, Hironobu, c/o K.K. Toshiba Intell. Prop. Div, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Waldren, Robin Michael MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96306868.9 | 20.09.1996 | [1997/13] | Priority number, date | JP19950244750 | 22.09.1995 Original published format: JP 24475095 | JP19950244751 | 22.09.1995 Original published format: JP 24475195 | [1997/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0764767 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0764767 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | [1998/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0764767 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F01K23/10, F02C7/16 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
F01K23/10 (EP,US);
F02C6/02 (EP,US);
F02C6/18 (EP,US);
F02C7/16 (EP,US);
F05D2260/2322 (EP,US);
Y02E20/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/13] | F01K23/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1997/13] | Title | German: | Kraftanlage mit kombiniertem Kreislauf | [1997/13] | English: | Combined cycle power plant | [1997/13] | French: | Centrale à cycle combiné | [1997/13] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 03.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01127006.3 / EP1184541 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH05141267 ; | [X]US4571935 (RICE IVAN G [US]) [X] 1,3,9-11 * column 10, paragraph L - column 11, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [X]JPH0486308 ; | [X]US5412937 (TOMLINSON LEROY O [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6 * column 3, line 24 - line 37; figure - *; | [XD]EP0062932 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [XD] 1,3,9,11 * page 6, line 18 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [XP]EP0674099 (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]) [XP] 1-4,9-12 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 36; figure - *; | [E]EP0735254 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [E] 1 * page 4, line L - page 5, line 1; figure - *; | [E]JPH08277726 ; | [E]EP0743425 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [E] 15 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 2 *; | [A]JPS60201011 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930924), vol. 017, no. 530, Database accession no. (M - 1485), & JP05141267 A 19930608 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,9-11 * abstract * [A] 12 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920708), vol. 016, no. 311, Database accession no. (M - 1277), & JP04086308 A 19920318 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,9,11 * abstract * | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 097, no. 002, & JP08277726 A 19961022 (HITACHI LTD) [E] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860228), vol. 010, no. 051, Database accession no. (M - 457), & JP60201011 A 19851011 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) [A] 16 * abstract * |