EP0771022 - Precision metal-metal capacitor for analog circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brabazon, Terry J. 5 Devon Hill Road Essex Junction, VT 05452 / US | 02 /
El-Kareh, Badih 106 Wimmer Road Hopewell Junction, New York 12533 / US | 03 /
Martin, Stuart R. R.R.2, Box 588 Hinesburg, VT 05461 / US | 04 /
Rutten, Matthew Jeremy 23 Elmer Place Milton, VT 05468 / US | 05 /
Kaanta, Carter Welling 58 Grandview Road Colchester, VT 05446 / US | [1997/18] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 96306961.2 | 25.09.1996 | [1997/18] | Priority number, date | US19950549450 | 27.10.1995 Original published format: US 549450 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0771022 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0771022 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/3205 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
H01L28/40 (EP,US);
H01L21/76895 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/18] | Title | German: | Präzisionskondensator Metall-Metall für analoge Schaltung | [1997/18] | English: | Precision metal-metal capacitor for analog circuit | [1997/18] | French: | Condensateur métal-métal de précision pour circuit analogique | [1997/18] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/40] | 12.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5366920 (YAMAMICHI SHINTARO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7 * column W *; | [PA]US5466964 (SAKAO MASATO [JP], et al) [PA] 1,2,6,7 * column W *; | [A]JPH0685193 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,2,6,7; | [A]EP0635891 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 3-5,8,9 * the whole document * |