EP0766393 - PPM demodulation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | ||
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545 / JP | ||
Former [1997/14] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohtani, Yoshihiro 3-1-2-301, Sakuragaoka, Seika-cho Souraku-gun, Kyoto / JP | [1997/14] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307062.8 | 27.09.1996 | [1997/14] | Priority number, date | JP19950253061 | 29.09.1995 Original published format: JP 25306195 | [1997/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0766393 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0766393 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | [2000/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0766393 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/49 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
H03K9/04 (EP,US);
H04L25/4902 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/14] | H03K9/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/14] | Title | German: | Pulspositionsdemodulator | [1997/14] | English: | PPM demodulation device | [1997/14] | French: | Démodulateur d'impulsions en position | [1997/14] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - BOERNER, HEICHLER, "4PPM modulator/demodulator with fully digital signal regeneration", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, Washington, US, (19890424), vol. 1131, pages 195 - 202, XP000089635 [A] 1-8 * page 196, paragraph 6 * * page 197, paragraph 8 * | [A] - PROVIDAKES, BARSOUM, "Modelling and simulation of a pulse position modulation (PPM) communicaitons system over urban multipath channels", THE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE 1991, New York, US, (19911104), ISBN 0-87942-691-8, pages 226 - 232, XP000273493 [A] 1-8 * page 227, column R, paragraph 3 * * page 228, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.1991.258241 | [A] - ELMIRGHANI ET AL., "Optical fibre n-ary PPM: natural acquisition sequences and frame phase extraction", HE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE 1993, New York, US, (19931129), pages 1906 - 1910, XP000436140 [A] 1,8 * page 1906, column R, paragraph 3 * |