EP0768448 - Cooled turbine vane assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | ||
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES ELECTRO SYSTEMS, INC. United Technologies Building Hartford Connecticut 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soechting, Friedrich O. 19483 Riverside Drive Tequesta, Florida 33469 / US | 02 /
Plank, William L. 72 Camelia Circle Tequesta, Florida 33469 / US | 03 /
Hall, Kenneth B. Dorfstrasse 15B 5315 Klingnau / CH | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307397.8 | 10.10.1996 | [1997/16] | Priority number, date | US19950541854 | 10.10.1995 Original published format: US 541854 | [1997/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0768448 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0768448 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18, F01D25/12 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F02C7/12 (KR);
F01D25/12 (EP,KR,US);
F01D5/082 (EP,US);
F01D5/18 (KR);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/16] | Title | German: | Gekühlte Schaufeln für ein Turbinenleitgitter | [1997/16] | English: | Cooled turbine vane assembly | [1997/16] | French: | Aubes statoriques réfrigerées pour turbines | [1997/16] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 08.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2787440 (THOMPSON JR WILLIAM F); | [A]DE1210254 (ROLLS ROYCE) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US3362681 (SMULAND ROBERT J) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 30 - column 4, line 46; figures 2-5 *; | [A]EP0034961 (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1,3-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US4930980 (NORTH WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 1,3-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0452109 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]EP0542403 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US5358374 (CORREIA VICTOR H S [US], et al); | [Y]WO9514848 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 1,3-14 * the whole document *; | [YP]WO9530069 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [YP] 1,3-14 * the whole document *; | [PX]US5488825 (DAVIS PAUL H [US], et al) [PX] 1-14 * column W * |