EP0769456 - A plastic cap and a process for the production of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKYO SEIKO, LTD. 38-2, Sumida 3-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | For all designated states DAIKYO SEIKO, LTD. 38-2, Sumida 3-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sudo, Morihiro 32-7, Sumida 3-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Togashi, Hiroshi 639-4, Furudo Abiko-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1997/17] | Representative(s) | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307515.5 | 16.10.1996 | [1997/17] | Priority number, date | JP19950270201 | 18.10.1995 Original published format: JP 27020195 | JP19960047505 | 05.03.1996 Original published format: JP 4750596 | [1997/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0769456 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0769456 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | [1997/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0769456 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/00, B65D51/18 | [1997/17] | CPC: |
B29C45/33 (EP,US);
B29C45/0081 (EP,US);
B65D51/002 (EP,US);
B65D51/18 (EP,US);
B29L2031/565 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0015 (EP,US);
B65D2251/009 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/17] | Title | German: | Kunststoffkappe und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1997/17] | English: | A plastic cap and a process for the production of the same | [1997/17] | French: | Capuchon en plastique et son procédé de fabrication | [1997/17] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/45: Teilanmeldung 97114528.9 eingereicht am 22/08/97 | EPB 1997/45: Divisional application 97114528.9 filed on 22/08/97 | EPB 1997/45: Demande divisionnaire 97114528.9 déposée le 22/08/97 | Examination procedure | 23.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 05.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97114528.9 / EP0819617 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 23.08.2000 | GR | 23.08.2000 | LU | 16.10.2000 | MC | 31.10.2000 | PT | 23.11.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | ES | 23.08.2000 | |
GR | 23.08.2000 | ||
MC | 31.10.2000 | ||
PT | 23.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | ES | 23.08.2000 | |
MC | 31.10.2000 | ||
PT | 23.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 23.08.2000 | |
PT | 23.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/18] | PT | 23.11.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH397457 (OWENS ILLINOIS GLASS CO [US]) [X] 1,2,9,10,12* page 3, lines 12-21; figures 3,4 *; | [X]US4180173 (DIAZ STEPHEN H [US]) [X] 1,2,9,10,12 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 24; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | JPS5252853U | JPS5420050U | JPS5664961 | JPS581662 | JPS5989855U | JPS63180556U | JPH0199969 | JPH0228917U | JPH0426362U | JPH0476871B | JPH05293159 |