EP0772153 - Smart card having a thin die [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clifton, Mark Bradford 18 Galston Drive Robinsville, New Jersey 08691 / US | 02 /
Verdi, Fred William 13 Larkspur Lane Lawrenceville, New Jersey 08648 / US | 03 /
Flynn, Richard Michael 16524 Audubon Court Noblesville, Indiana 46060 / US | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307635.1 | 22.10.1996 | [1997/19] | Priority number, date | US19950558579 | 31.10.1995 Original published format: US 558579 | [1997/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0772153 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0772153 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | [1999/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
G06K19/07728 (EP);
G06K19/07745 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/73265 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/19] | Title | German: | Chipkarte mit dünnem Chip | [1997/19] | English: | Smart card having a thin die | [1997/19] | French: | Carte intelligente à puce mince | [1997/19] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/34] | 31.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.01.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.10.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0676717 (AT & T CORP) [X] 1-4 * column 5, line 50 - column 7, line 29; figures 2-4 * | by applicant | US19940225687 |