EP0807481 - Tool attachment assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sugino Corp. 1700 N. Penny Lane Schaumburg Illinois 60173 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states Sugino Corp. 1700 N. Penny lane Schaumburg, Illinois 60173 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugino, Shigeru 7-12-3 Shindaiji-Kitamachi Cyofu-city, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ishikawa, Kazuyuki 902 Sumiyoshi Toyama city, Toyama Pref. 936 / JP | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Barnfather, Karl Jon, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Barnfather, Karl Jon, Dr., et al Withers & Rogers, 4, Dyer's Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307815.9 | 29.10.1996 | [1997/47] | Priority number, date | US19960649479 | 17.05.1996 Original published format: US 649479 | [1997/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0807481 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0807481 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/08, B23G1/46, B23G5/20 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
B23B31/083 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17017 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17965 (EP,US);
Y10T408/03 (EP,US);
Y10T408/95 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/47] | Title | German: | Werkzeughaltevorrichtung | [1997/47] | English: | Tool attachment assembly | [1997/47] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'un outil | [1997/47] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 27.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00125420.0 / EP1086767 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Request for further processing for: | 20.04.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 26.04.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS57173420 ; | [A]DE3835496 (HAEFNER OTTO GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1524868 (MATSUMOTO M) [A] 1-9,20-22 * page 3, line 21 - line 118; figures 4-6 *; | [A]DE3241382 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,15,20-22 * the whole document *; | [AD]US4514115 (AKASHI YUKIMASA [JP]) [AD] 1,6-8,10-14 * column A; figures 2,3,5,6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830122), vol. 7, no. 16, Database accession no. (M - 187), & JP57173420 A 19821025 (HIDEO YOSHIDA) [A] 1-22 * abstract * | by applicant | US4111442 | US4439075 | US4547101 | US4364694 | US4514115 |