EP0772115 - System, output device, method, and computer-usable medium using a split printer driver to control a computer printer device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/19] | System and method using a split printer driver to control a computer printer device | ||
[2002/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leclair, Gregory A. 183 Kona Place San Jose, California 95119 / US | 02 /
Nakamura, Kazuo c/o Seiko Epsom Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nogano / JP | [1997/27] |
Former [1997/19] | 01 /
Leclair, Gregory A. 183 Kona Place San Jose, California 95119 / US | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307906.6 | 31.10.1996 | [1997/19] | Priority number, date | US19950550749 | 31.10.1995 Original published format: US 550749 | [1997/27] |
Former [1997/19] | US19950550915 | 31.10.1995 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0772115 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0772115 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
G06F3/1208 (EP);
G06F3/1296 (US);
G06F3/1211 (EP);
G06F3/1247 (EP);
G06F3/1285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/19] | Title | German: | System, Ausgabegerät, Verfahren, und rechnerlesbares Medium, die zum Steuern eines Druckers einen gespaltenen Druckertreiber verwenden | [2002/29] | English: | System, output device, method, and computer-usable medium using a split printer driver to control a computer printer device | [2002/29] | French: | Système, dispositif de sortie, méthode et support lisible par oridinateur utilisant un driver d'imprimante divisé pour commander un dispositif d'imprimante d'ordinateur | [2002/29] |
Former [1997/19] | System und Verfahren, das zum Steuern eines Druckers einen gespaltenen Druckertreiber verwendet | ||
Former [1997/19] | System and method using a split printer driver to control a computer printer device | ||
Former [1997/19] | Système et méthode utilisant un driver d'imprimante divisé pour commander un dispositif d'imprimante d'ordinateur | Examination procedure | 03.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 15.12.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0578264 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7,9,11 * figures 2,4,5 * * page 5, line 11 - page 17, line 54 *; | [A]EP0578256 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-5,9 * figures 2-5 * * column 3, line 41 - column 11, line 2 * * column 11, line 17 - line 41 * |