EP0772327 - Electronic mail forwarding system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | ||
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuki, Hikaru Mikasa-ryo Honkan 314, 492, Minosho-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara 639-11 / JP | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308063.5 | 06.11.1996 | [1997/19] | Priority number, date | JP19950287377 | 06.11.1995 Original published format: JP 28737795 | [1997/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0772327 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0772327 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | [1999/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0772327 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, H04B7/26 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
H04L51/214 (EP);
H04L51/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/19] | Title | German: | System zum Weiterleiten von elektronischer Post | [2005/04] | English: | Electronic mail forwarding system | [1997/19] | French: | Système de transport de courrier électronique | [1997/19] |
Former [1997/19] | System zum Weiterleiten von elektronischen Post | Examination procedure | 23.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/33] | 26.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9014726 (HATTON LESLIE [GB]) [A] 1,4,8 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 2 ** page 3, line 21 - line 26 *; | [A]WO9408419 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,4,8 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 18 * * page 7, line 19 - page 8, line 6 * |