EP0774773 - Data acquisition system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LECO CORPORATION 3000 Lakeview Avenue St. Joseph Michigan 49085 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states LECO CORPORATION 3000 Lakeview Avenue St. Joseph, Michigan 49085 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mason, Michael Charles 2172 Ann Drive St. Joseph, Michigan 49085 / US | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode, 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308268.0 | 15.11.1996 | [1997/21] | Priority number, date | US19950558783 | 16.11.1995 Original published format: US 558783 | [1997/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0774773 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0774773 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | [1999/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0774773 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/40, G06F17/40 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
H01J49/0036 (EP,US);
H01J49/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/21] | Title | German: | Datenerfassungssystem | [1997/21] | English: | Data acquisition system | [1997/21] | French: | Système d'acquisition de données | [1997/21] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 21.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.09.2003 | GB | 03.12.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/45] | GB | 03.12.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5367162 (HOLLAND JOHN F [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-16,18-22 * abstract * * column 11, line 39 - line 46 * * column 13, line 20 - line 37 * * column 20, line 7 - column 21, line 25 * [Y] 5; | [Y]US5294926 (CORCORAN JOHN J [US]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * column 1, line 13 - line 24 *; | [A]US4490806 (ENKE CHRISTIE G [US], et al) [A] 7,11,13,18-22 * abstract * * column 4, line 24 - column 6, line 6 *; | [A]US5175430 (ENKE CHRISTIE G [US], et al) [A] 7,11,20-22 * column 4, line 36 - line 64 *; | [A]US5463219 (BUCKLEY PETER [CA], et al) [A] 3,4 * abstract * * column 2, line 24 - line 28 * |