EP0774614 - Apparatus and method for vaporizing a liquid cryogen and superheating the resultant vapor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THERMO KING CORPORATION 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55420 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states THERMO KING CORPORATION 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viegas, Herman H. 7710 West 87th Street Bloomington, Minnesota 55438 / US | 02 /
Ellingson, Bradley G. 8641 Columbus Avenue South Bloomington, Minnesota 55420 / US | 03 /
Aronov, Michael A. 23318 Greenlawn Avenue Beachwood, Ohio 44122 / US | 04 /
Sheridan, Roger D. 1104 Broad Street Wadsworth, Ohio 44281 / US | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308294.6 | 15.11.1996 | [1997/21] | Priority number, date | US19950560919 | 20.11.1995 Original published format: US 560919 | [1997/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0774614 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0774614 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F17C9/02 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
F25D29/001 (EP,US);
F17C9/02 (EP,US);
G05D23/1917 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0338 (EP,US);
F17C2221/013 (EP,US);
F17C2221/014 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0161 (EP,US);
F17C2223/033 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0313 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0332 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0346 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0393 (EP,US);
F17C2250/032 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0631 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0694 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/21] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Verdampfung einer kryogenen Flüssigkeit und Überhitzung des erzeugten Dampfes | [1997/21] | English: | Apparatus and method for vaporizing a liquid cryogen and superheating the resultant vapor | [1997/21] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour vaporiser un liquide cryogénique et surchauffer la vapeur produite | [1997/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0003395 (ZINK CO JOHN [US]); | [A]FR2370921 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2611348 (LINDE AG [DE]); | [A]US2343727 (ZENNER GEORGE H) | by applicant | US19950501372 |