EP0775820 - Injectors fixing structure for engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Isuzu Motors Limited 26-1, Minami-ohi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states ISUZU MOTORS LIMITED 26-1, Minami-ohi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Haruyo, Isuzu Motors Ltd., Fujisawa Fact. 8, Tsuchidana Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken 252 / JP | [1997/22] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/22] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308331.6 | 18.11.1996 | [1997/22] | Priority number, date | JP19950327925 | 24.11.1995 Original published format: JP 32792595 | [1997/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0775820 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0775820 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/14 | [1997/22] | CPC: |
F02M61/14 (EP);
F02B2275/18 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/22] | Title | German: | Befestigungsstruktur von Einspritzventilen für Brennkraftmaschinen | [1997/22] | English: | Injectors fixing structure for engines | [1997/22] | French: | Agencement de fixation des injecteurs pour moteurs à combustion interne | [1997/22] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 08.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.02.2002 | [2008/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4205263 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 33; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4315233 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 20; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3325104 (ROOSA VERNON D) [A] 1 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 50; figures 1-3 *; | [PA]EP0724075 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1 * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 45; figures 1,2 *; | [E]EP0751290 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [E] 1,2 * column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 9; figures 3-6 * | by applicant | JPH0317171U | JPH0669359U |