EP0778235 - Surface winder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parkinson Machinery and Manufacturing Corp. 100 Goldstein Drive, Highland Industrial Park Woonsocket Rhode Island 02895 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states Parkinson Machinery and Manufacturing Corp. 100 Goldstein Drive, Highland Industrial Park Woonsocket, Rhode Island 02895 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cavanagh, Kenneth M. 175 Miantonomo Drive Warwick, Rhode Island 02888 / US | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308782.0 | 04.12.1996 | [1997/24] | Priority number, date | US19950567888 | 08.12.1995 Original published format: US 567888 | [1997/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0778235 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0778235 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | [1998/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0778235 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65H18/20, B65H19/22 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
B65H18/20 (EP,US);
B65H19/2253 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41361 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/24] | B65H18/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/24] | Title | German: | Aufwickelmaschine | [1997/24] | English: | Surface winder | [1997/24] | French: | Bobineuse | [1997/24] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.10.2002 | IT | 02.10.2002 | GB | 02.01.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/35] | FR | 02.10.2002 | |
GB | 02.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 02.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9426641 (BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US3258217 (MACARTHUR FULTON H, et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US3817467 (DAMBROTH J) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |