EP0778484 - Illumination device and liquid crystal apparatus including same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoshi, Hiroaki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308788.7 | 04.12.1996 | [1997/24] | Priority number, date | JP19950316798 | 05.12.1995 Original published format: JP 31679895 | JP19960312317 | 22.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31231796 | [1997/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0778484 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0778484 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | [1998/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0778484 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/28, G02F1/1335, F21V8/00 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
G02B27/28 (EP,US);
G02B6/0038 (EP,US);
G02B6/0056 (EP,US);
G02B6/0055 (EP,US);
G02B6/0068 (EP,US);
G02F1/133536 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/24] | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsvorrichtung und diese enthaltender Flüssigkristallapparat | [1997/24] | English: | Illumination device and liquid crystal apparatus including same | [1997/24] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage et appareil à cristaux liquides comprenant le-même | [1997/24] | Examination procedure | 09.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 31.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Request for further processing for: | 26.06.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 23.06.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.07.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.04.2002 | NL | 17.04.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/04] | NL | 17.04.2002 | |
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 17.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0597261 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,12,16 * page 11, line 18 - line 56; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPH07199184 ; | [E]WO9708582 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [E] 1-6,12-18,21 * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 13; figure 2 *; | [E]EP0770818 (SHARP KK [JP]) [E] 1,2,4,6,12,16 * column 3, line 09 - column 4, line 50 * * column 5, line 43 - line 53 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 95, no. 11, & JP07199184 A 00000000 (NEC) [A] 1,16 * abstract * |