EP0778538 - Optical scanner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wike, Charles Kenneth, Jr. 1030 Secret Cove Drive Sugar Hill, Georgia 30518 / US | 02 /
Kien, Thai-Bao Hoang 1119 Pepperwood Trail Norcross, Georgia 30093 / US | 03 /
Belknap, William Martin 715 Singley Court Lawrenceville, Georgia 30244 / US | 04 /
Lindacher, Joseph Michael 2200 Satellite Blvd,Apt.221 Duluth, Georgia 30155 / US | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Irish, Vivien Elizabeth International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/28] | Irish, Vivien Elizabeth International IP Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [1997/24] | Robinson, Robert George International Intellectual Property Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308800.0 | 04.12.1996 | [1997/24] | Priority number, date | US19950569540 | 08.12.1995 Original published format: US 569540 | [1997/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0778538 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0778538 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | [1999/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0778538 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
G06K7/10643 (EP,US);
G06K7/10693 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/24] | Title | German: | Optischer Abtaster | [1997/24] | English: | Optical scanner | [1997/24] | French: | Dispositif de balayage optique | [1997/24] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 06.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45] | Request for further processing for: | 27.02.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 27.02.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.03.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0532220 (NCR INT INC [US]) [AD] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0535905 (NCR INT INC [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]EP0541292 (NCR INT INC [US]) [AD] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]US5221832 (COLLINS JR DONALD A [US], et al) [AD] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5288983 (NAKAZAWA ATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-3,6,7 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0615207 (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1* figure -; claim - * | by applicant | EP0532220 | EP0541292 | US5221832 |