EP0848360 - Electronic funds transfer authentication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2000 [2000/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1998/34] |
Former [1998/25] | 01 /
Rossmann, Alain 663 Newell Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Representative(s) | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre, 120 Holborn London EC1N 2TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96309005.5 | 11.12.1996 | [1998/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848360 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10, G07F19/00 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
G07F7/0866 (EP);
G06Q20/04 (EP);
G06Q20/10 (EP);
G06Q20/20 (EP);
G06Q20/3223 (EP);
G06Q20/327 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/09] |
Former [1998/25] | GB | Title | German: | System zum Beglaubigen von elektronischen Geldüberweisungen | [1998/25] | English: | Electronic funds transfer authentication system | [1998/25] | French: | Système d'authentification de transferts de fonds électroniques | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/02] | 16.08.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.02.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.02.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4965821 (BISHOP RONALD D [US], et al); | [A]US5208446 (MARTINEZ JERRY R [US]); | [A]WO9411849 (VATANEN HARRI TAPANI [FI]); | [A]EP0693742 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE]); | [XA]EP0708547 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,7,9-12,14,16 * abstract * * column 1, line 32 - column 2, line 12 * * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 5 * * column 5, line 27 - column 8, line 53 * [A] 4; | [A]WO9613814 (VAZVAN BEHRUZ [FI]); | [A]WO9632700 (AU SYSTEM [SE], et al) [A] 1,2,8-11,15,16 * the whole document * |