EP0783152 - Method and apparatus for automatically managing concurrent access to a shared resource in a multi-threaded programming environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [1997/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clark, Peter D. 1114 Steeplechase Lane Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [1997/28] | Representative(s) | Hogg, Jeffery Keith, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [2008/35] |
Former [1997/28] | Hogg, Jeffery Keith, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 96309241.6 | 18.12.1996 | [1997/28] | Priority number, date | US19960582661 | 04.01.1996 Original published format: US 582661 | [1997/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0783152 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0783152 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0783152 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [1997/28] | CPC: |
G06F9/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1997/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur automatischen Verwaltung von gleichzeitigem Zugriff auf gemeinsame Betriebsmittel in einer Multifaden-Programmierbetriebsumgebung | [1997/28] | English: | Method and apparatus for automatically managing concurrent access to a shared resource in a multi-threaded programming environment | [1997/28] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la gestion automatique d'accès simultané aux ressources partagées dans un environnement de programmation à fils multiples | [1997/28] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 27.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 08.11.2006 | SE | 08.02.2007 | FR | 22.06.2007 | [2008/23] |
Former [2007/29] | NL | 08.11.2006 | |
SE | 08.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0218871 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-24* column 1, line 12 - column 3, line 11 *; | [A]US5450592 (MCLEOD MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1-24 * column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 12 *; | [A] - "ELIMINATION OF SERIALIZED SYNCHRONOUS I/O DURING CONCURRENT INDEX SEARCHES", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19900801), vol. 33, no. 3B, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 51 - 52, XP000124259 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | Examination | - SILBERSCHATZ A.; GALVIN P.B.: 'Operating System Concepts', 1994, ADDISON-WESLEY PUBLISHING COMPANY, INC, pages 111-114 |