EP0785625 - Protection arrangement for a switching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Controls Ltd Boughton Road Rugby Warwickshire CV21 1BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states ALSTOM Controls Ltd Boughton Road Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 1BU / GB | ||
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states CEGELEC CONTROLS LTD. Boughton Road Rugby Warwickshire CV21 1BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crane, Allan David 24 Main Street, Clifton-upon-Dunsmore Rugby, Warwickshire CV23 OBH / GB | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Dargavel, Laurence Peter, et al ALSTOM Intellectual Property 33 Clifton Road Matlock Bath, Derbyshire DE4 3PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Dargavel, Laurence Peter, et al ALSTOM Intellectual Property, 33 Clifton Road Matlock Bath, Derbyshire DE4 3PW / GB | ||
Former [1999/32] | Dargavel, Laurence Peter Alstom UK Limited, PO Box 70, Mill Road Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 1TB / GB | ||
Former [1997/30] | Hoste, Colin Francis The General Electric Company p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96309293.7 | 19.12.1996 | [1997/30] | Priority number, date | GB19960000808 | 16.01.1996 Original published format: GB 9600808 | [1997/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0785625 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0785625 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | [1999/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0785625 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0785625 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/0814, H03K17/082 | [1997/30] | CPC: |
H03K17/0828 (EP,US);
H03K17/08148 (EP,US);
H03K17/107 (EP,US);
H03K17/18 (EP,US);
H03K17/127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [2005/27] |
Former [1997/30] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | Schutzanordnung für eine Schaltvorrichtung | [1997/30] | English: | Protection arrangement for a switching device | [1997/30] | French: | Montage de protection pour un dispositif de commutation | [1997/30] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 18.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0666647 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [A] 1-19 * column 7, line 25 - line 54; figure 7 *; | [A]DE2702181 (B & B STEUERUNGSTECHNIK GMBH) [A] 1-19 * page 5, paragraph 4 *; | [A]US4626952 (MORIKAWA TETSUO [JP]) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]EP0227407 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-19 * page 5, line 1 - line 11 * |