EP0807715 - Road traffic sign of solid graphic pattern [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sekisui Jushi Kabushiki Kaisha 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | [2006/39] |
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states Sekisui Jushi Kabushiki Kaisha 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noguchi, Kazuhiro 17-2-409, Bessho-hommachi Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP | 02 /
Deki, Nobuhisa 15 Kisshoin Nakajima-cho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601 / JP | 03 /
Nagata, Takeshi 24-21, Gunge-shimmachi Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP | 04 /
Inagaki, Yohei 4-8-11, Gotenyama-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | [2006/22] |
Former [1997/47] | 01 /
Noguchi, Kazuhiro 17-2-409, Bessho-hommachi Takasuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP | ||
02 /
Deki, Nobuhisa 15 Kisshoin Nakajima-cho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601 / JP | |||
03 /
Nagata, Takeshi 24-21, Gunge-shimmachi Takasuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP | |||
04 /
Inagaki, Yohei 4-8-11, Gotenyama-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96309487.5 | 24.12.1996 | [1997/47] | Priority number, date | JP19960118031 | 13.05.1996 Original published format: JP 11803196 | [1997/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0807715 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0807715 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0807715 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E01F9/04 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
E01F9/512 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/47] | Title | German: | Strassenmarkierung aus massivem graphischem Muster | [1997/47] | English: | Road traffic sign of solid graphic pattern | [1997/47] | French: | Signalisation routière en motif graphique massif | [1997/47] | Examination procedure | 31.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 16.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.09.2006 | [2008/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR1547707 (R. DERUDDER) [Y] 5 * page 2, column 1, line 1 - line 5; figure 3 * [A] 1,10,11; | [A]US3722109 (JACOBSON N) [A] 1-3 * page 1, line 49 - line 68 *; | [A]GB2246799 (MARSHALLS MONO LTD [GB]) [A] 1-5,9-11 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE9206820U (DEBUSCHEWITZ GMBH & CO KG VERK [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-13 * the whole document * [Y] 5; | [A]DE4228666 (KLASEN GEB TESDORFF RENATE [DE]) | Examination | US824374 |