EP0782207 - Nonaqueous type secondary battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | ||
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545 / JP | ||
Former [1997/27] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Kazuo Kongo-ryo, 192-1,Hajikami, Shinjo-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara / JP | 02 /
Mitate, Takehito 65-4, Noguchi Yamatotakada-shi, Nara / JP | 03 /
Nishimura, Naoto Kongo-ryo, 192-1, Hajikami, Shinjo-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara / JP | 04 /
Tsukuda, Yoshihiro 4-1-9-306, Oji-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Minato, Kazuaki 5-1-2-1308, Shiginonishi Joto-ku, Osaka-fu, Osaka / JP | [1997/27] | Representative(s) | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96309540.1 | 24.12.1996 | [1997/27] | Priority number, date | JP19950336697 | 25.12.1995 Original published format: JP 33669795 | JP19960326371 | 06.12.1996 Original published format: JP 32637196 | [1997/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0782207 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0782207 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/58, H01M10/40 | [1997/27] | CPC: |
H01M4/587 (EP,US);
H01M10/0569 (EP,US);
H01M4/362 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0037 (EP,US);
H01M2300/004 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/27] | Title | German: | Nichtwässrige Sekundärbatterie | [1997/27] | English: | Nonaqueous type secondary battery | [1997/27] | French: | Batterie secondaire du type non-aqueux | [1997/27] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 02.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0517070 (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,4,11 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 11 * * column 4, line 15 - column 6, line 57 * [Y] 2,3,5-10; | [DY]EP0520667 (SHARP KK [JP]) [DY] 2,3 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 13 *; | [Y]WO9013924 (MOLI ENERGY LTD [CA]) [Y] 5-10 * page 12, line 33 - page 13, line 13 * * page 14, line 33 - page 15, line 6 * * claims 1-6 *; | [Y]JPH06140076 ; | [A]JPH06290809 ; | [A]JPH07153446 ; | [A]US5344724 (OZAKI YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 6, lines 43-68 * * column 8, line 64 - column 9, line 10; claims 1-5 *; | [A]JPH0620690 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940812), vol. 018, no. 434, Database accession no. (E - 1592), & JP06140076 A 19940520 (SONY CORP) [Y] 10 * abstract * | [X] - KURIBAYASHI I ET AL, "BATTERY CHARACTERISTICS WITH VARIOUS CARBONACEOUS MATERIALS", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, (19950301), vol. 54, no. 1, pages 1 - 5, XP000541703 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-7753(94)02030-7 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 095, no. 001, & JP06290809 A 19941018 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 095, no. 009, & JP07153446 A 19950616 (SHARP CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940420), vol. 018, no. 221, Database accession no. (E - 1540), & JP06020690 A 19940128 (TORAY IND INC) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH04368778 | - J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (1995), vol. 142, pages 1746 - 1752 |