EP0725140 - Process of extraction of periplasmic proteins from prokaryotic microorganisms in the presence of arginine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI-SYNTHELABO 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | [2003/38] |
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states Sanofi-Synthélabo 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states SANOFI 174, avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states SANOFI 32-34, rue Marbeuf F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Legoux, Richard En Manart F-31460 Le Faget / FR | 02 /
Maldonado, Paul 23, Avenue du 8 Mai 1945 F-69360 St. Symphorien d'Ozon / FR | 03 /
Salome, Marc Avenue de la République, résidence les Ormes II F-31320 Castanet Tolosan / FR | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400201.8 | 29.01.1996 | [1996/32] | Priority number, date | FR19950001083 | 31.01.1995 Original published format: FR 9501083 | [1996/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0725140 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0725140 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/67, C07K1/14, C12P21/02, // C07K14/54, C07K14/61 | [1996/32] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/32] | Extension states | LT | 02.02.1996 | LV | 02.02.1996 | SI | 02.02.1996 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Extraktion von periplasmatischen Proteinen aus prokaryotischen Mikroorganismen in der Anwesenheit von Arginin | [1996/32] | English: | Process of extraction of periplasmic proteins from prokaryotic microorganisms in the presence of arginine | [1996/32] | French: | Procédé d'extraction de protéines périplasmiques de microorganismes procaryotes en présence d'arginine | [1996/32] | Examination procedure | 31.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/39] | 14.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.09.2003 | GB | 17.09.2003 | IE | 17.09.2003 | IT | 17.09.2003 | NL | 17.09.2003 | DK | 17.12.2003 | GR | 17.12.2003 | SE | 17.12.2003 | DE | 18.12.2003 | PT | 26.12.2003 | ES | 28.12.2003 | LU | 29.01.2004 | BE | 31.01.2004 | CH | 31.01.2004 | LI | 31.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/23] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
GB | 17.09.2003 | ||
IE | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
DK | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
DE | 18.12.2003 | ||
PT | 26.12.2003 | ||
ES | 28.12.2003 | ||
LU | 29.01.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2004 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
GB | 17.09.2003 | ||
IE | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
DK | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
DE | 18.12.2003 | ||
PT | 26.12.2003 | ||
ES | 28.12.2003 | ||
BE | 31.01.2004 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
GB | 17.09.2003 | ||
IE | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
DK | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
DE | 18.12.2003 | ||
PT | 26.12.2003 | ||
ES | 28.12.2003 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
GB | 17.09.2003 | ||
IE | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
DK | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
DE | 18.12.2003 | ||
PT | 26.12.2003 | ||
ES | 28.12.2003 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
GB | 17.09.2003 | ||
IE | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
DK | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
DE | 18.12.2003 | ||
PT | 26.12.2003 | ||
ES | 28.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/45] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
GB | 17.09.2003 | ||
IE | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
DK | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
DE | 18.12.2003 | ||
PT | 26.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
IE | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
DK | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
DE | 18.12.2003 | ||
PT | 26.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
IE | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
DK | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
PT | 26.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
IE | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
PT | 26.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
IE | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 17.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS6244198 ; | [A]JPS6251983 ; | [Y]EP0217379 (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 5,6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8810307 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 18, line 8 - line 9 * * page 21, line 31 - line 35 * * page 22, line 1 - line 7 * * page 25, line 37 - line 40 * * page 26, line 1 - line 24 *; | [AD]EP0360641 (SANOFI SA [FR]) [AD] 1-3 * column W *; | [A]EP0393725 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column W *; | [A]WO9222665 (REGENERON PHARMA [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870729), vol. 11, no. 232, Database accession no. (C - 437), & JP62044198 A 19870226 (HANAKA KEIZO) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870811), vol. 11, no. 246, Database accession no. (C - 439), & JP62051983 A 19870306 (YOSHIHIDE HAGIWARA) [A] 5,6 * abstract * | [A] - BROWN ET AL., "Purification by bioaffinity chromatography of two arginine-specific periplasmic binding proteins", DISS. ABSTR. INT. B, (1976), vol. 37, no. 5, pages 200 - 201, XP002000663 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * |