EP0729698 - Seed drill with one hopper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAASLAND N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [2000/10] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states LELY FRANCE Km 4, route de Paris F-61000 Alencon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charles, Stéphane 5, rue Claude Hilleret 72000 Le Mans / FR | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Loyer, Bertrand Cabinet Loyer & Abello 9, rue de la Forge 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | Loyer, Bertrand Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400412.1 | 28.02.1996 | [1996/36] | Priority number, date | FR19950002347 | 01.03.1995 Original published format: FR 9502347 | [1996/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0729698 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0729698 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01C15/00 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
A01C15/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/36] | Title | German: | Sähmaschine mit ein Saatkasten | [1996/36] | English: | Seed drill with one hopper | [1996/36] | French: | Semoir à trémie unique | [1996/36] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/12] | 04.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   10.04.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0124491 (SICMA) [Y] 1 * column W * [A] 2; | [DY]FR2691039 (RAUCH) [DY] 1 * page 13, line 28 - page 21; figures 1-8 *; | [A]GB2103175 (KNIGHT) [A] 1,5,7 * page 1, line 108 - page 2, line 51; figures 1-5 *; | [A]GB2216762 (JENKINS) [A] 1,4-6 * page 2, line 26 - page 6, line 28; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE359392 (TRÖSTER) |