EP0730363 - Method and device for receiving multiple bit rates by unique filtering for interpolation and adaption [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL N.V. Burgemeester Elsenlaan 170 2288 BH Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states ALCATEL N.V. Burgemeester Elsenlaan 170 NL-2288 BH Rijswijk / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sehier, Philippe 71, rue Jean Jaures 92300 Levallois Perret / FR | 02 /
Bertrand, Cyril 102, rue Lemercier 75017 Paris / FR | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/17] | Sciaux, Edmond, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département Propriété Industrielle 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1996/36] | Scheer, Luc, et al SOSPI 14-16, rue de la Baume 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400446.9 | 01.03.1996 | [1996/36] | Priority number, date | FR19950002429 | 02.03.1995 Original published format: FR 9502429 | [1996/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0730363 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/03, H04L7/02 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
H04L7/0029 (EP,US);
H04L25/03038 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03477 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FI, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/36] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Empfang mehrerer Bitraten mit Hilfe einer einzigen Filterung zur Interpolation und Anpassung | [1996/36] | English: | Method and device for receiving multiple bit rates by unique filtering for interpolation and adaption | [1996/36] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de réception multidébit à filtrage unique d'interpolation et d'adaption | [1996/36] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0609095 (SIGNAL PROCESSORS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-3,12,14,16 * column 2, line 32 - line 41 * * column 3, line 15 - line 48 * * column 7, line 25 - line 34 * * column 16, line 21 - line 36 * * column 17, line 14 - line 46 * * column 18, line 28 - line 48 * * column 18, line 50 - column 19, line 6 * * column 19, line 34 - line 38 * * column 20, line 58 - column 21, line 10 * * column 28, line 46 - line 56 * * figures 1,4,10,11 *; | [YA]EP0466434 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-3,12,14,16 * page 3, line 38 - page 4, line 5 * * page 4, line 43 - page 6, line 8; figures 1,2 * [A] 4,13,17; | [A]EP0340978 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,13,17 * page 3, line 42 - line 48 * * page 8, line 8 - line 25 * * page 21, line 11 - page 22, line 11 * * page 26, line 23 - line 55 * * figures 1A-1C,11 * * figures 21A,12B *; | [A]US4856030 (BATZER JOHN L [US], et al) [A] 1-3,13,17 * column 4, line 61 - line 68 * * column 7, line 19 - line 32 * * column 10, line 22 - column 11, line 30; figures 3-6 * | [A] - GHOSH B R ET AL, "Asynchronous adaptive equalization in voiceband data modems", ICASSP-92: 1992 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (CAT. NO.92CH3103-9), SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA, 23-26 MARCH 1992, ISBN 0-7803-0532-9, 1992, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, (19920323), vol. 4, pages 485 - 488 vol.4, XP000467240 [A] 1-3,12-18 * page 485, column R, line 19 - page 487, column L, line 50 * | [A] - WATANABE K, "Adaptive matched filter and its significance to anti-multipath fading", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS '86. ICC '86: 'INTEGRATING THE WORLD THROUGH COMMUNICATIONS'. CONFERENCE RECORD (CAT. NO.86CH2314-3), TORONTO, ONT., CANADA, 22-25 JUNE 1986, 1986, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, (19860622), vol. 3, pages 1455 - 1459 vol.3, XP002005127 [A] 1,4,12,17 * page 1457, column R, line 61 - page 1458, column L, line 21 * * page 1457, column R, line 26 - line 43; figure 4 * |