EP0732735 - Monolithic ceramic electronic device and method of manufacturing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 226 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 226 / JP | ||
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 226 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawakami, Hiroyuki, c/o Murata Manufac. Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 02 /
Kohno, Yoshiaki, c/o Murata Manufac. Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 03 /
Kubodera, Noriyuki, c/o Murata Manufac. Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | [1996/38] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400545.8 | 15.03.1996 | [1996/38] | Priority number, date | JP19950057303 | 16.03.1995 Original published format: JP 5730395 | JP19950079120 | 04.04.1995 Original published format: JP 7912095 | [1996/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0732735 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0732735 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | [1997/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0732735 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/48, C04B41/51, H01G4/30 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
H01G4/308 (EP,US);
H01G4/12 (KR);
H01L21/4857 (EP,US);
H05K3/108 (EP,US);
H05K3/205 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0156 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0315 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1142 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/38] | H01L21/48 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/38] | Title | German: | Monolithisches Keramikbauelement und seine Herstellung | [2005/13] | English: | Monolithic ceramic electronic device and method of manufacturing same | [1996/38] | French: | Dispositif céramique et méthode de fabrication associée | [1996/38] |
Former [1996/38] | Monolithische Keramik und ihre Herstellung | Examination procedure | 05.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 14.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.12.2005 | IT | 14.12.2005 | NL | 14.12.2005 | DK | 14.03.2006 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/01] | BE | 14.12.2005 | |
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | BE | 14.12.2005 | |
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | BE | 14.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0485176 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * see the whole document *; | [Y]US5046236 (WADA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20 * see figures 1-7 with the corresponding description; column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 28; column 3, lines 4-10 *; | [Y]US4221047 (NARKEN BERNT, et al) [Y] 1-20 * see the abstract and figures 4A-4C with the corresponding description *; | [Y]US4879156 (HERRON LESTER W [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * see the whole document *; | [Y]EP0474176 (TELEFUNKEN SYSTEMTECHNIK [DE]) [Y] 1,2,10-12,15,19,20 * see figure 1 with the corresponding description *; | [Y]JPH0729771 ; | [Y]JPS6021393 ; | [Y]US4929295 (KOHNO YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 7-9 * see figures 8,9 with the corresponding description *; | [A]US5101319 (DIFFEYES ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] * see the abstract; columns 1-2; figures 1-11 with the corresponding description * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 095, no. 004, & JP07029771 A 19950131 (MURATA MFG CO LTD) [Y] 1,19 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850608), vol. 009, no. 134, Database accession no. (C - 285), & JP60021393 A 19850202 (SUMITOMO DENKI KOGYO KK) [Y] 7-9 * abstract * |