EP0733649 - Peroxycarboxylic ester photoinitiators derived from nitrogen heterocycles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/39] | Peroxycarboxylic ester initiators derived from nitrogen heterocycles | ||
[1999/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haubrich, Jeanne E., 3M, c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufac. Company, 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400569.8 | 19.03.1996 | [1996/39] | Priority number, date | US19950407617 | 21.03.1995 Original published format: US 407617 | [1996/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0733649 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0733649 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/50, G03F7/031 | [1996/39] | CPC: |
C07D241/24 (EP,US);
C07D213/78 (EP,US);
C07D219/04 (EP,US);
C07D239/74 (EP,US);
C07D241/44 (EP,US);
C07D251/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/39] | Title | German: | Peroxycarbonsäureester Photoinitiatoren abgeleitet von Stickstoff-Heterozyklen | [1999/44] | English: | Peroxycarboxylic ester photoinitiators derived from nitrogen heterocycles | [1999/44] | French: | Peresters photoamorceurs dérivés d'hétérocycles contenant de l'azote | [1999/44] |
Former [1996/39] | Peroxicarbonsäure Esterinitiatoren Derivaten von Stickstoffheterocyclen | ||
Former [1996/39] | Peroxycarboxylic ester initiators derived from nitrogen heterocycles | ||
Former [1996/39] | Initiateurs esters d'acides péroxycarboxyliques dérivés d'hétérocycles de l'azote | Examination procedure | 24.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/21] | 17.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 19.03.2001 | [2002/16] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0007059 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [DA]EP0126541 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD [JP]) |