EP0735132 - Compact powdery detergent composition for washing textiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.1999 [1999/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE S.A. 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie / FR | [1996/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Avice, Maryline 99, avenue de Verdun 95100 Argenteuil / FR | 02 /
Boittiaux, Patrick 10, rue de l'Abbé Pouchard 94160 Saint Mande / FR | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Fabre, Madeleine-France, et al RHODIA SERVICES Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 40 Rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Fabre, Madeleine-France, et al RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 25 Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400604.3 | 22.03.1996 | [1996/40] | Priority number, date | FR19950003673 | 29.03.1995 Original published format: FR 9503673 | [1996/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0735132 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/12, C11D3/36, C11D3/37, C11D3/08 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
C11D3/361 (EP);
C11D3/08 (EP);
C11D3/10 (EP);
C11D3/128 (EP);
C11D3/364 (EP);
C11D3/3761 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/40] | Title | German: | Für die Wäsche von Textilien geeignete kompakte pulverförmige Detergentienzusammensetzung | [1996/40] | English: | Compact powdery detergent composition for washing textiles | [1996/40] | French: | Formulation détergente compacte en poudre pour lavage du linge | [1996/40] | Examination procedure | 30.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 01.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/12] | 28.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0291869 (HENKEL KGAA) [Y] 1-12 * page 4, line 15 - line 24 * * page 2, line 20 - line 55 * * page 3, line 1 - line 23 * * claim - *; | [YD]EP0488868 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE) [YD] 1-12 * page 3, line 2 - line 58 * * page 4 * * page 6, line 26 - line 58 * * claim - *; | [A]DE4213036 (HENKEL KGAA) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0184794 (HENKEL KGAA) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [AD]FR2269575 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH) [AD] 1,2 * claim - *; | [A]EP0608642 (RHONE POULENC CHEMICALS) [A] 1 * the whole document * |